Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 710 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2434 Week
» 12569 Month
» 328800 Year
» 839902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3848 y/e 1917
BR 43848 w/e 04/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1917
Withdrawal w/e Mon 11/06/1962
Scrapping During 10/1962
Service Life 45 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31A St Rollox (Balornock) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/04/1959
66B Motherwell 4w/e 11/03/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 11/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 08/12/1945
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 11/03/1961
WDN   w/e 11/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1917 To Service To service as LMS Number 3848
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Rollox (Balornock) (31A)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43848    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
11/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 43848    

prev prev