Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3854 y/e 1918
BR 43854 w/e 29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1918
Withdrawal Sat 06/06/1964
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 46 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
16B Spital Bridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9F Heaton Mersey 8w/e 29/11/1952
15D Coalville w/e 13/12/1958
   Withdrawn 06/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 01/11/1952
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 29/11/1952
WDN   w/e 06/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1918 To Service To service as LMS Number 3854
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43854    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Coalville (15D)    
06/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 43854    
09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev