Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4316 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17722 Week
» 70738 Month
» 190265 Year
» 3217118 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3860 |
y/e |
1918 |
British Railways |
43860 |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1918 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/09/1959 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 28/02/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1918 |
18B |
|
Westhouses |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
18A |
|
Toton |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/09/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
28/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1918 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3860 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43860 |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43860 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|