Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 402 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1364 Week
» 18164 Month
» 334395 Year
» 845497 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3870 y/e 1918
BR 43870 w/e 23/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1918
Withdrawal Sat 02/11/1963
Scrapping During 11/1963
Service Life 45 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15A Wellingborough 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17B Burton w/e 10/01/1959
16A Nottingham w/e 07/11/1959
16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/03/1963
   Withdrawn 02/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland w/e 11/03/1950
ALLOC 17B Burton 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 30/03/1963
WDN   w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1918 To Service To service as LMS Number 3870
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43870    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
02/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 43870    

prev prev