Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 707 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 12566 Month
» 328797 Year
» 839899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3878 y/e 1918
BR 43878 w/e 29/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1918
Withdrawal Sat 05/12/1959
Scrapping During 09/1960 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 42 yrs , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
20A Holbeck (MR) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A Saltley 4w/e 22/03/1952
   Withdrawn 05/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20E Manningham w/e 08/05/1948
ALLOC 20D Normanton w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC 20B Stourton w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 22/03/1952
WDN   w/e 05/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1918 To Service To service as LMS Number 3878
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43878    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
05/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 43878    
09/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev