Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 708 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2432 Week
» 12567 Month
» 328798 Year
» 839900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3891 y/e 1919
BR 43891 w/e 25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1919
Withdrawal Sat 05/01/1957
Scrapping Sat 19/01/1957
Service Life 38 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
21A Saltley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18C Hasland 4w/e 31/10/1953
   Withdrawn 05/01/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East w/e 15/04/1950
ALLOC 18C Hasland 4w/e 31/10/1953
WDN   w/e 05/01/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1919 To Service To service as LMS Number 3891
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 43891    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
05/01/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 43891    

prev prev