Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1435 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19238 Week
» 72254 Month
» 191781 Year
» 3218634 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3899 |
y/e |
1919 |
British Railways |
43899 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1919 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 01/10/1962 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1919 |
30B |
|
Hurlford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
67A |
|
Corkerhill |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
67B |
|
Hurlford |
4w/e |
18/11/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
30B |
Hurlford |
4w/e |
10/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
30B |
Hurlford |
4w/e |
08/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 572. 40605, 637. 40906. 41147. 42780. 42832. 43849/99, 44783. 4796, 44878/80. 44967. 45010/16/49. 45115/66167/77/79, 45357/58. 45481/91, 45582, 45713/15/16. 14441. 54462/77, 14499, 54504, 55229, 16157, 16266, 16343, 57307/60, 17366. 17459. 17666. 57686. 17691. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1919 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3899 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hurlford (30B) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43899 |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43899 |
|
|
11/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|