Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1391 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19194 Week
» 72210 Month
» 191737 Year
» 3218590 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3901 |
y/e |
1919 |
British Railways |
43901 |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1919 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/09/1957 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1919 |
14A |
|
Cricklewood East |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/09/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
4w/e |
30/03/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/09/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1919 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3901 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43901 |
|
|
09/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43901 |
|
|