Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1044 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14450 Week
» 67466 Month
» 186993 Year
» 3213846 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3904 |
y/e |
1920 |
British Railways |
43904 |
w/e |
26/01/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1920 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 27/06/1959 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/06/1951 |
\"4F\" Class 0-6-0 |
Of the 772 engines comprising this class, only 15 still carry their L.M.S. numbers-3840 (17A), 3904 (23C), 3942 (20C), 4003 (20C), 4032 (23C), 4098 (20D), 4245 (20B), 4248 (21A), 4335 (20B), 4401 (16A), 4404 (20A), 4435/6 (17B), 4457 (19C), 4568 (19A). |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1920 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3904 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (20F) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (23C) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (23C) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43904 |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43904 |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|