Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 876 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2991 Week
» 25497 Month
» 328687 Year
» 1550252 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 3905 y/e 1920
British Railways 43905 w/e 17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1920
Withdrawal Sat 22/07/1961
Scrapping During 12/1961
Service Life 41 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) y/e 1920
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 22/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 13A Plaistow w/e 16/08/1947
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East w/e 26/02/1949
WDN   w/e 22/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/07/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings ) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1920 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3905
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
17/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43905    
22/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 43905    

prev prev