Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 401 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1363 Week
» 18163 Month
» 334394 Year
» 845496 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3906 y/e 1920
BR 43906 w/e 21/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1920
Withdrawal Mon 11/10/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966
Service Life 45 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
19C Canklow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20C Royston 4w/e 22/03/1952
   Withdrawn 11/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 20C Royston 4w/e 22/03/1952
WDN   11/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1920 To Service To service as LMS Number 3906
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Canklow (19C)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43906    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 43906    

prev prev