Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1405 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19208 Week
» 72224 Month
» 191751 Year
» 3218604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3908 |
y/e |
1920 |
British Railways |
43908 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1920 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/11/1964 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1920 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3908 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Belle Vue (19E) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43908 |
|
|
15/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (13A) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
07/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43908 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|