Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 708 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2432 Week
» 12567 Month
» 328798 Year
» 839900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3918 y/e 1920
BR 43918 w/e 09/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1920
Withdrawal Sat 27/02/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965
Service Life 45 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
17D Rowsley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16B Spital Bridge 2w/e 17/06/1950
16A Nottingham 4w/e 28/01/1956
16F Burton w/e 23/05/1964
16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 10/10/1964
   Withdrawn 27/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 16B Spital Bridge w/e 24/06/1950
ALLOC 17D Rowsley w/e 29/07/1950
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 16F Burton 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 10/10/1964
WDN   w/e 27/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1920 To Service To service as LMS Number 3918
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rowsley (17D)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43918    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (16B)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (16F)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
27/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 43918    
21/03/1965 Sightings A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed John Thickitt - depot visit Link

prev prev