Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 401 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1363 Week
» 18163 Month
» 334394 Year
» 845496 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3919 y/e 1920
BR 43919 w/e 18/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1920
Withdrawal Thu 05/11/1959
Scrapping During 08/1961
Service Life 39 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
17B Burton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14B Kentish Town 4w/e 06/11/1954
17C Coalville 8w/e 05/10/1957
15C Leicester Midland w/e 07/03/1959
   Withdrawn 05/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17B Burton w/e 20/09/1947
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 17C Coalville 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 28/03/1959
WDN   w/e 05/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1920 To Service To service as LMS Number 3919
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Burton (17B)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43919    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Coalville (17C)    
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
05/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 43919    

prev prev