Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3923 y/e 1920
BR 43923 w/e 12/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1920
Withdrawal Sat 08/02/1964
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 44 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
18A Toton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18A Toton 4w/e 27/03/1954
17C Coalville 4w/e 08/10/1955
16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 10/01/1959
14B Kentish Town w/e 20/06/1959
14A Cricklewood East w/e 05/12/1959
16C Mansfield w/e 16/01/1960
16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/04/1960
   Withdrawn 08/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15D Bedford w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 20/03/1954
ALLOC 17C Coalville 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 16C Mansfield 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 08/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1920 To Service To service as LMS Number 3923
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43923    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Coalville (17C)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
08/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 43923    

prev prev