Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1014 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7221 Week
» 4734 Month
» 232618 Year
» 1454183 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3924 m/e 10/1920
BR 43924 w/e 05/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 10/1920
Withdrawal Wed 16/06/1965
Service Life 44 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1920
22B Gloucester Barnwood 01/01/1948
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/09/1962
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 09/02/1963
   Withdrawn 16/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/09/1962
TOSTORE NYA   4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 09/02/1963
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   16/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/02/1959 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop-40563I, 43924G, 44606G, 47341G, 48538G, 73038G, 80066G, D5011 new. D/E Erecting shop-10000/1, 10203, 10800, 12000, 12082, 13083, 13169, D3568, D8014, new work-D3763-D3767 new. Outside-dED2. Test House-D5009/10. Erecting shop, 1 bay- 42374G, 42501G, 42520I, 44216I, 44518I, 47223G, 47379G, 47405G, 48003G, 48010G, 48317I, 48367G, 48409I, 73126I, 73159I, 75056G, 80088G, 42409 an 47376 stripping. Erecting shop, 2 bay- 42136I, 44477I, 48011I, 73125I, 73128I, 48050 stripping. Erecting shop, 3 bay- 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D/E D5012-8 new, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/Es, D5008. Yard- 40047, 40680, 42354, 43946, 43970, 47309, 48364 frames, 48517, 10100, D2910, D8001. SLS/195903

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1920 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3924
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
05/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43924    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
16/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 43924    

prev prev