Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 712 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2436 Week
» 12571 Month
» 328802 Year
» 839904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3932 y/e 1920
BR 43932 y/e 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1920
Withdrawal Sat 01/09/1962
Scrapping Fri 05/10/1962
Service Life 42 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
22B Gloucester Barnwood 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A Saltley 4w/e 08/08/1953
22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/10/1953
17B Burton 4w/e 24/04/1954
22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 17/07/1954
21B Bournville 4w/e 09/10/1954
21A Saltley w/e 22/11/1958
9G Gorton w/e 16/12/1961
   Withdrawn 01/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 17B Burton 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 21B Bournville 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   w/e 01/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1920 To Service To service as LMS Number 3932
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 43932    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
16/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
01/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 43932    

prev prev