Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1777 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19580 Week
» 72596 Month
» 192123 Year
» 3218976 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3941 |
y/e |
1921 |
British Railways |
43941 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
To Service |
During y/e 1921 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/09/1957 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 13/09/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1921 |
21A |
|
Saltley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
18A |
|
Toton |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/09/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/09/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1921 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3941 Built at Armstrong Whitworth |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43941 |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43941 |
|
|
13/09/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|