|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1959 | Midland & Great Northern Railway closure | On 28th February the 1-45 p.m. Birmingham (New Street)-Yarmouth had Class 4F 44542 (17B) as far as Leicester where 43060 took over to Spalding; Restaurant car E668E was attached there too; the 9 a.m. Yarmouth-Birmingham New Street arrived behind 43036 (21A)'; the 4 p.m. Spalding-Nottingham was worked by 43058 (40F) and the 4-20 p.m. Nottingham-Kings Lynn by 43954 (16A), changed to 43061 (40F) at Bourne; the 4-20 p.m. Kings Lynn-Nottingham arrived at Bourne behind 43060 changing to 43954 and this was the last train going west from Bourne-43060 returned to Spalding with a goods. 43090 ran the 5-45 p.m. Kings Lynn-Peterboro' and 43135 the 8-37 p.m. Peterboro'-Melton Constable. At Yarmouth Beach, the S.M.'s bell tolled out for the last trains and at Norwich City the Reepham Parish Council gave the last diesel an official send-off just before midnight. Track demolition commenced immediately on the East Rudham-Melton and Sutton Bridge-South Lynn sections-the latter was double-track ! A daily goods now runs between Spalding and Bourne (diesel hauled) and serves also the Billingboro' branch (SK); similarly between South Lynn and East Rudham; two daily goods run between Spalding and Sutton Bridge and two between Melton Constable and Norwich City and between Peterboro' and Wisbech Harbour with an additional service between Peterboro' and Eye Green. The Saxby-South Witham section still has its 6 freights each way to and from the L.M.R. | SLS/195904 |
28/02/1959 | Midland & Great Northern Railway closure | On 28th February the 1-45 p.m. Birmingham (New Street)-Yarmouth had Class 4F 44542 (17B) as far as Leicester where 43060 took over to Spalding; Restaurant car E668E was attached there too; the 9 a.m. Yarmouth-Birmingham New Street arrived behind 43036 (21A)'; the 4 p.m. Spalding-Nottingham was worked by 43058 (40F) and the 4-20 p.m. Nottingham-Kings Lynn by 43954 (16A), changed to 43061 (40F) at Bourne; the 4-20 p.m. Kings Lynn-Nottingham arrived at Bourne behind 43060 changing to 43954 and this was the last train going west from Bourne-43060 returned to Spalding with a goods. 43090 ran the 5-45 p.m. Kings Lynn-Peterboro' and 43135 the 8-37 p.m. Peterboro'-Melton Constable. At Yarmouth Beach, the S.M.'s bell tolled out for the last trains and at Norwich City the Reepham Parish Council gave the last diesel an official send-off just before midnight. Track demolition commenced immediately on the East Rudham-Melton and Sutton Bridge-South Lynn sections-the latter was double-track ! A daily goods now runs between Spalding and Bourne (diesel hauled) and serves also the Billingboro' branch (SK); similarly between South Lynn and East Rudham; two daily goods run between Spalding and Sutton Bridge and two between Melton Constable and Norwich City and between Peterboro' and Wisbech Harbour with an additional service between Peterboro' and Eye Green. The Saxby-South Witham section still has its 6 freights each way to and from the L.M.R. | SLS/195904 |
09/01/1961 | Derby Works (Works Sidings) | Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1921 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3954 Built at Armstrong Whitworth |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) | ||
11/03/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 43954 | ||
07/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
21/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43954 | ||
04/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |