Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1425 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14831 Week
» 67847 Month
» 187374 Year
» 3214227 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3956 |
y/e |
1921 |
British Railways |
43956 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
To Service |
During y/e 1921 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/05/1956 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 02/06/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1921 |
16A |
|
Nottingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/05/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/05/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1921 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3956 Built at Armstrong Whitworth |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43956 |
|
|
12/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43956 |
|
|
02/06/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|