Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3967   01/1922
BR 43967 w/e 20/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
To Service During 01/1922
Withdrawal Sat 28/08/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965
Service Life 43 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15D Bedford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18C Hasland 4w/e 06/09/1958
16G Westhouses w/e 24/10/1964
9L Buxton (LNWR) w/e 07/11/1964
   Withdrawn 28/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18C Hasland 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 9L Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   w/e 28/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1922 To Service To service as LMS Number 3967
Built at Armstrong Whitworth
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bedford (15D)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 43967    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L)    
28/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 43967    

prev prev