31/01/1946 |
Belle Vue MPD |
The following interesting visitors were noted during January: 2829 (21A); 3319 (16B); 3982 (15A); 3615 (4A); 4853 (20A), 5298 (8A); 12861 (23B). During February: 3231 (20G); 3335 (20G); 3454 (15D); 3620 (21A); 3859 (16B); 4045 (22B); 4186 (21A); 4292 (11E). On 9/2 6132 (20A) passed through on an express travelling in the direction of Manchester Victoria. |
SLS/194604 |
13/05/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay - stripping) |
Paint shop-44467G, 44603 G, 48186 I, 48405 G, 73030 I, 73032 G, 12092, D3767/8 New; Diesel Erecting shop-10202, 12053, ED4/5, D3085, D3491, D5702; New Work-8 d/e shunters 0-6-0 (D3769-76). Test House-D5015/6/7, D3124; Diesel Finishing Shop-D5018, D1 Scafell Pike, D2 Helvellyn; Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay-42375I, 42505 I, 42641 I, 44036 G, 44092 G, 44097 G, 44195 I, 44206 I, 44213 G, 44387 G, 44582 G, 47255 G, 47378 I, 47442 G, 48088 I, 48374 G, 48636 G, 48673 I, 73136 I, 75005 I; Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay - stripping-52532, 43982, 44049, 44211. Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay-41000 (Boiler RBS 5240 no, 12594, type G9 ex 40928; present state-6 frame inserts, boiler in, motion and slide bars in partly, driving splashers and footplate supports fitted), 42508 I, 42531 I, 44188 I, 44414 I, 47414 I, 73132 I; Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay - stripping-73144; Erecting Shop, no. 3 bay-4 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 (D3-6), 6 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo (D5019-24); Yard-40047, 40680, 43205/54, 42541, 42661, 44588, 45032, 47309, 48111, 48385, 48643, 53806, 58281, 10100, 10800, Cecil Raikes. Stored locos. moved into Wks. yard-40931, 41068, 41119/63/4/7/93, 43231/301/441/522/745 an 43815. Stored locos, by side of Test House-40412/536, 41062, 41857 an 47214. |
SLS/195906 |
17/08/1959 |
Derby Works (Yard) |
Paint shop-MR 1000, 44579, 48390; Diesel Erecting Shop-12047/95, 13084/118/9/72, D3771, ED4; New Work-11 D/E sh. 0-6-0, D3782-92 new; Test House-D2, D3781, D5021; Diesel Finishing shop- D3/4, D5008/22/3; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay, 42415I, 42517/36G, 44122I, 44172G, 44214G, 44279/377I, 44389/402 G, 44468I, 44472G, 48053/346/77/463G; Also, 42395, 44166/191, 80091stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42393I, 44164I, 47453I, 75057I, 80144I, 73014stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P.-D5024-31new, 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P, D5-D8new; Yard-40047/680, 42257/308/27/54/400/624, 43210/386/982, 44092/139/154/169, 45250, 47309, 48335/392/418, 48715 frames, 58213, 10000/203/800, D5020, D5700/17, Cecil Rakes. |
SLS/195909 |
17/09/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay) |
Paint shop-44389/529/8346, D4, D3785, D5023; Diesel Erecting Shop-10201, 11126, 12038, 13091, New Work-9 D/E Sh. D3787-95new; Diesel Finishing Shop-D2/3/5, D5025; Test House-D5024; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay-42281 I, 42512 I, 42514 G, 42517 I. 42624 G. 44267 G, 44355 I, 44539 G, 47386 I, 47413 G, 47681 G, 48274/552 I, 48600 G, 48715 G, 80091 G. Stripping-44201, 47598, 48108/218stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42337/53 I, 43982 I. 44214/472 Casual, 80040 I; Stripping-47315stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-9 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo D5026-34new etc., 5 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 D6-10new; Yard-40047, 40332/680, 42257/314/54/422, 42537 frames, 42686, 43886/935, 44122/69/87/327/77/402/560, 44807, 47309, 48177/293/672/87, 58191, 75046, 10100/800, 12000/36/55, D3786, ED4, Cecil Raikes. |
SLS/195910 |
06/04/1962 |
Derby Works (Outside) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D1, D3, D72, D90, D105, D2506, D2912, D3124, D3859, D5020/2/30/76/86/9/91/2. Test House: D162, D2908, D5029/88, D5136, 10203. New Building: D167-D176. Finishing Shop: D69, D74, D165/6, D5028, D5133. Erecting Shop: D3067/8, D3371, D3585/7, 13117/68/78, 42542, 44243, 44425, 47321, 47534, 48272/82, 48413, 48669/87, 53808, 73140, 75016. Paint Shop: D163 Leicestershire and Derbyshire Yeomanry, D164, M.R. 1000, 42350, Outside : 43982. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D2508, D5137, 12000, 41168, 42332/63/75, 42448, 43263, 43410/64, 43760, 43825, 43938/85, 44092, 44154, 44561/83, 47218/59, 47310/40, 47601, 48094, 'Spike Island' (Gasworks): Cut up remains of 42387, 44166, 47353 an 47516. |
SLS/196205 |