Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2077 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19880 Week
» 72896 Month
» 192423 Year
» 3219276 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3983 |
y/e |
1922 |
British Railways |
43983 |
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
To Service |
During y/e 1922 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/08/1965 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
17B |
Burton |
4w/e |
20/02/1954 |
ALLOC |
16A |
Nottingham |
4w/e |
10/07/1954 |
ALLOC |
20E |
Manningham |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/08/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1922 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3983 Built at Armstrong Whitworth |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mansfield (16D) |
|
|
30/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43983 |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
09/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43983 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|