Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 401 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1363 Week
» 18163 Month
» 334394 Year
» 845496 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3984 y/e 1922
BR 43984 w/e 12/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
To Service During y/e 1922
Withdrawal Sat 17/01/1959
Scrapping During 06/1960
Service Life 37 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
20F Skipton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23C Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 19/05/1951
11A Carnforth 3w/e 24/01/1953
11E Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 21/03/1953
   Withdrawn 17/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 28/04/1951
ALLOC 11A Carnforth 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 11E Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 21/03/1953
WDN   w/e 17/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1922 To Service To service as LMS Number 3984
Built at Armstrong Whitworth
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (20F)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43984    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (23C)    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (11E)    
17/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 43984    

prev prev