Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 709 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2433 Week
» 12568 Month
» 328799 Year
» 839901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3987 y/e 1921
BR 43987 w/e 05/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1921
Withdrawal Sat 13/07/1963
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 42 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
20B Stourton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 13/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   12/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1921 To Service To service as LMS Number 3987
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stourton (20B)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43987    
13/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 43987    

prev prev