Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 708 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2432 Week
» 12567 Month
» 328798 Year
» 839900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3992 y/e 1921
BR 43992 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1921
Withdrawal Sat 09/02/1957
Scrapping Sat 23/02/1957
Service Life 36 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
18B Westhouses 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17D Rowsley 4w/e 19/05/1951
20F Skipton 4w/e 08/10/1955
   Withdrawn 09/02/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 17B Burton w/e 28/04/1951
ALLOC 20F Skipton 4w/e 08/10/1955
WDN   w/e 09/02/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1921 To Service To service as LMS Number 3992
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 43992    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17D)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (20F)    
09/02/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 43992    

prev prev