31/08/1950 |
Derby Works |
For works: 12000, 40012/51/8, 40353, 414, 40498, 40515, 527, 40567, 684, 40917/26/8, 41017/58/72/7/81, 41124/60/9, 41710, 1748, 41961, 42508/15, 3099, 43216/24, 3271, 43283, 3484, 43538, 3738/59/60, 43835/54/62, 43909/16/29/94, 44020/45/94/6, 44137, 44414/33/75, 44566, 47220, 7237, 47287, 7324, 47356, 7395, 7403/5/17/51, 47506, 7507,7542/81, 58033, 1406, 58080, 58224, W.2108 and 'J.39' 4721/37/85, 64980, 4956. Ex Works: 42146, UTA.57, 12070-3 (new): and after repair 40410, 40535/56, 40929, 41088, 41535, 41672, 41752, 41889, 42353, 42510, 43224, 43446, 43574, 43690, 44127/37/90, 44242, 44362, 44414/72, 44521, 47280, 47342/56/65, 47426, 47526, 58220/4/9, 64762/84/97, 64960 and 2097. New Construction, in various stages 2-6-4T 42050-4 (Order 4310) and D/E 12074/5 almost complete. Being cut up 41034, 58036 (24/8). The works yard contained 22853, 43818, 43297, 41017, 3511, 40515 (all condemned) and 58033, 1406, 40498 (under consideration). |
SLS/195012 |
14/11/1958 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) |
14th Nov. Paint shop- 42524 I, 43975 G, 47438 I, D3561 New, D5003/4 New. D/E shop- 10202, 10800, 12043, 13057/124, 15004, ED7, 10 D/E shunters D3562-71 (Order D658, 60-69). Test House- D5002. Erecting shop-1 bay, 42349 I, 42513 G, 43994 G, 44007 I, 44245 G, 44566 G, 47599 G, 47621 G, 48026 G, 48182 I, 48212 I, 48339 I, 48352 G, 48359 G, 48503 G, 48547 G, 53802 I, 75020 G, 80064 I, 80142 I. Erecting shop-2 bay- 42230 I, 42332 I, 43844, 43972 I, 47404 I, 48114 I, 48415 I, 48662 G, 80140 I. Erecting shop-3 bay- 9 Bo-Bo D/E 1160 H,P. D5005-13, 3 1Co-Col D/E 2300 H.P. D1, D3 an D4. Yard- 40047, 40420, 40680, |
SLS/195812 |
16/01/1962 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. |
SLS/196202 |
10/08/1962 |
Derby Works (Outside Paint Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D48, D104, D132, D179, D5000/80, 10001. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D5, D178, D3125, D5017. Test House: D90, D122, D176, D5018, Pullman Coach No. uM60090. Shunter Test House: D3121. New Building: D183-D192. Finishing Shop: D68, D108, D180-D182, D5022. Erecting Shop: D2386, D3117/77, 12054, 42240/7, 42335, 42413, 44321, 44575, 48000, 48132, 48673, 48759, 73161/5. Paint Shop: D177, MR1000. Outside Paint Shop: 43994. 'Stone Pit': 73159, 75063. 'Foundry Row': 42069, 42500, 43216, 43682, 44122, 73131. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D58, D87, D96, D5014/28, D5134, 10201/3, 73137 (frames only). |
SLS/196209 |
16/11/1962 |
Derby Works (On Shed) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D4, D36, D58, D83, D91, D112, D121, D144, D191, D5010, D5023/87. Outside D.E. Shop : D5, D56, D114, D128, D5027. Test House: D5032, D5127. Outside Test House: D9, D115, D5005, Pullman uM60091. Shunter Test House : D2908. New Building : D165, D189, D192/3, D5186-5195. Finishing Shop: D74, D131, D188, D190, D5001/31. Erecting Shop: D87, D93, D118, D3126, 42087, 47326/38/78, 48395, 73011/6/25/46, 73136/41, 75003/14. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000 (Paintwork being touched up). Stone Pit: 47642, 48494, 75013. Foundry Row : D65, D81, 10000, 10202, 42500, 43496, 75056. Klondyke Sidings : ED6, ED7, D5145, D5400. Bone Yard : 10201/3, 42146. On Shed awaiting cut up : 40088. Ex Works on Shed: ED3, D2236 (5B), D2507 (6C), D5021 (1A), 43994, 47000, 73139. |
SLS/196212 |