Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 712 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2436 Week
» 12571 Month
» 328802 Year
» 839904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3995 y/e 1921
BR 43995 w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1921
Withdrawal Sat 15/06/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 42 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
18A Toton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 03/12/1955
15A Wellingborough 4w/e 26/01/1957
15D Coalville w/e 22/09/1962
   Withdrawn 15/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 15D Coalville 5w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 15/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1921 To Service To service as LMS Number 3995
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43995    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Coalville (15D)    
15/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 43995    

prev prev