Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 404 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1366 Week
» 18166 Month
» 334397 Year
» 845499 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3996 y/e 1921
BR 43996 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1921
Withdrawal Mon 12/03/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 41 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67B Hurlford 4w/e 25/11/1950
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 21/04/1951
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 21/10/1961
   Withdrawn 12/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 08/12/1945
ALLOC 67B Hurlford m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 2w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 2w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   w/e 12/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1921 To Service To service as LMS Number 3996
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 43996    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
12/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 43996    

prev prev