Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 712 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2436 Week
» 12571 Month
» 328802 Year
» 839904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3998 y/e 1921
BR 43998 w/e 05/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1921
Withdrawal Sat 14/11/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 38 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
20B Stourton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17B Burton w/e 10/01/1959
   Withdrawn 14/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 18B Westhouses w/e 07/05/1949
ALLOC 17B Burton 5w/e 31/01/1959
WDN   w/e 14/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1921 To Service To service as LMS Number 3998
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stourton (20B)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43998    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
14/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 43998    

prev prev