Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1554 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14960 Week
» 67976 Month
» 187503 Year
» 3214356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4000 |
y/e |
1921 |
British Railways |
44000 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/12/1959 |
Service Life |
39 yrs , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1921 |
20F |
|
Skipton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20G |
Hellifield |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
ALLOC |
20F |
Skipton |
4w/e |
27/04/1946 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1921 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4000 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (20F) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44000 |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44000 |
|
|
04/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|