Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4001 y/e 1921
BR 44001 w/e 21/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1921
Withdrawal Mon 26/03/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 41 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67B Hurlford 4w/e 25/11/1950
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 21/04/1951
   Withdrawn 26/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 08/12/1945
ALLOC 67B Hurlford m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 2w/e 21/04/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 26/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1921 To Service To service as LMS Number 4001
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 44001    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
26/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 44001    

prev prev