|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/03/1963 | Derby Works (Works yard) | D42, D78, D82, D99, D107, D117/9, D120/1, D5027/88, D5393. Outside: D5002/18, D5189. Test House: D48, D113/8, D3372, D5136/87/8/91/2/3. Diesel Finishing Shop: D70, D5010, D5194/5/6. Paint Shop: D5190. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 43637, 44393, 48619, 73045, 75061, D8, D2913, D3020, D5012, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D54, D109, D5083/4; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5197-D5210 new. Works yard: 40026, 42392/422/72/500, 42784, 44004/112, 44228 frames, 44519, 47003, 47276, 58138, 73159, u60093, D64, D94, D111, D130, D5005/31. Stored outside Works offices: 10000/201/2/3. | SLS/196304 |
30/04/1963 | Oswestry Works (Works yard) | Oswestry Works in April contained ex GSWR 0-6-0T ex Hafod Colliery (NBL 21621 of 1917). | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1921 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4004 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Mansfield (16D) | ||
25/06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44004 | ||
18/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) | ||
10/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mansfield (16D) | ||
17/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mansfield (16D) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mansfield (16D) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
22/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44004 | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |