Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4017 y/e 1922
BR 44017 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1922
Withdrawal During 08/1957
Scrapping During 10/1957
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
17D Rowsley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17A Derby 4w/e 28/01/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   w/e 10/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1922 To Service To service as LMS Number 4017
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rowsley (17D)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44017    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 44017    

prev prev