Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 709 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2433 Week
» 12568 Month
» 328799 Year
» 839901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4018 y/e 1922
BR 44018 w/e 23/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1922
Withdrawal During 12/1959
Scrapping During 12/1960
Service Life 38 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
17D Rowsley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17A Derby 4w/e 19/04/1952
17D Rowsley 4w/e 16/05/1953
17A Derby 4w/e 08/08/1953
17D Rowsley 4w/e 05/09/1953
16A Nottingham 4w/e 29/01/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 17D Rowsley 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 17D Rowsley 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 29/01/1955
WDN   w/e 05/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1922 To Service To service as LMS Number 4018
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rowsley (17D)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 44018    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17D)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17D)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 44018    

prev prev