Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2312 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20115 Week
» 73131 Month
» 192658 Year
» 3219511 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4024 |
y/e |
1922 |
British Railways |
44024 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/01/1957 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1922 |
17D |
|
Rowsley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5D |
|
Stoke |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
5F |
|
Uttoxeter |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
19/01/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
17D |
Rowsley |
w/e |
28/06/1947 |
LOAN |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
ALLOC |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
4w/e |
04/09/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/07/1950 |
Derby Works |
Engines into works: 1672, 41903, 42310, 3361, 43446, 4007, 44024, 44190, 44230, 44362, 4521, 7233, 47256, 7280, 7365, 12068, 53802, 53804, 58036. 58234, 64765, 64962, 2097. |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1922 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4024 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rowsley (17D) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44024 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
11/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44024 |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|