Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 75 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4932 Week
» 16637 Month
» 348126 Year
» 424713 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4123   07/1925
BR 44123 w/e 14/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 07/1925
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Service Life 39 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15C Leicester Midland 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 07/10/1950
85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 04/05/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland w/e 12/04/1947
ALLOC 22B Gloucester Barnwood w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 04/05/1964
WDN   03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1925 To Service To service as LMS Number 4123
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44123    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 44123    

prev prev