Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 111 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 111 Week
» 7295 Month
» 315276 Year
» 1199657 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4189 m/e 04/1925
BR 44189 w/e 03/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Scrapping During 11/1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
68B Dumfries 4w/e 26/11/1955
67A Corkerhill 8w/e 27/10/1956
67C Ayr 4w/e 18/11/1961
67B Hurlford 4w/e 08/09/1962
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 68B Dumfries 4w/e 26/11/1955
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 67C Ayr 2w/e 18/11/1961
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 3w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as LMS Number 4189
Built at St. Rollox Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44189    
26/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (68B)    
27/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 44189    

prev prev