Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 531 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6285 Week
» 34243 Month
» 68885 Year
» 1290450 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4272 m/e 11/1926
BR 44272 w/e 27/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 11/1926
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 29/06/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 36 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
22B Gloucester Barnwood 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
84D Leamington 4w/e 12/08/1961
85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 09/09/1961
82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 11/08/1962
   Withdrawn 4w/e 29/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 09/09/1961
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 11/08/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   4w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1926 To Service To service as LMS Number 4272
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44272    
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 44272    

prev prev