Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 173 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4685 Week
» 27191 Month
» 330381 Year
» 1551946 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4297 m/e 02/1927
British Railways 44297 w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 02/1927
Withdrawal During 09/1963
Scrapping During 11/1963
Service Life 36 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1927
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 22/03/1952
15A Wellingborough w/e 15/09/1962
16A Nottingham w/e 26/01/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 02/02/1963
WDN   w/e 31/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4297
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
26/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44297    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 44297    

prev prev