Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 264 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4002 Week
» 1515 Month
» 229399 Year
» 1450964 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4319 m/e 01/1928
BR 44319 w/e 17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 01/1928
Withdrawal Mon 27/11/1961
Scrapping During 01/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 10 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1928
30B Hurlford 01/01/1948
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 25/10/1958
67C Ayr 4w/e 13/02/1960
   Withdrawn 27/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 67C Ayr 4w/e 13/02/1960
WDN   27/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/08/1949 Inverness Lochgorm Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 4319, 4798, 45320. SLS/194910
18/11/1961 Inverurie Works (Awaiting shopping or being shopped) Awaiting shopping or being shopped: 44283, 44319/24, 57251, 64564, 64812, 73106. Awaiting scrapping: 55200/2. Scrapped: 40574/9/94, 40603/48, 43883, 55236, 57349/56/73, 57554, 64534/65, 65227, 68459/71 remains. Ex-Works: 57611. SLS/196112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4319
Built at St. Rollox Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hurlford (30B)    
17/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44319    
25/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
13/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
27/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 44319    

prev prev