Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 1081 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5655 Week
» 33613 Month
» 68255 Year
» 1289820 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4422 m/e 10/1927
BR 44422 w/e 10/06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 10/1927
Withdrawal Thu 03/06/1965
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 23/04/1960
82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 03/12/1960
82E Bristol Barrow Road w/e 22/11/1964
85B Gloucester Horton Road 2w/e 07/02/1965
   Withdrawn 03/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 23/04/1960
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 2w/e 28/11/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 2w/e 07/02/1965
WDN   03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1927 To Service To service as LMS Number 4422
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 44422    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
22/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
07/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 44422    

prev prev