Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 913 m/e 06/1927
BR 40913 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 06/1927
Withdrawal Thu 11/08/1955
Scrapping During 08/1955
Service Life 28 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Corkerhill 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32B Aviemore 3w/e 11/12/1948
63A Perth South 4w/e 16/05/1953
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 07/08/1954
   Withdrawn 11/08/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 27A Polmadie 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 32A Inverness w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC 32B Aviemore w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 63B   w/e 01/01/1949
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 07/08/1954
WDN   11/08/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1927 To Service To service as LMS Number 913
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40913    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Aviemore (32B)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
07/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
08/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 40913    

prev prev