Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 220 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7680 Week
» 5193 Month
» 233077 Year
» 1454642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 920 m/e 07/1927
BR 40920 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 07/1927
Withdrawal Tue 13/05/1958
Scrapping During 07/1958
Service Life 30 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1927
30A Corkerhill 01/01/1948
68C Stranraer 4w/e 12/05/1956
   Withdrawn 13/05/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Corkerhill w/e 29/03/1947
ALLOC 30D Ayr w/e 23/10/1948
ALLOC 68C Stranraer 4w/e 21/04/1956
WDN   13/05/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-*40636(4341) 15/7; 40665(3804) 30/6; 40920(3256) 14/6; 40921(4267) 17/6; 41146(3795) 14/7; 41147(3792) 10/6; 41149(4166) 3/6; 41177(3340) 18/6; 41183(3530) 9/7; 42204 26/6; 42215 1/7; 42699 11/6; 42745(4171) 3/8; 42805(4015) 24/6; 42884(4212) 25/5; 42908(4263) 3/6; *42912(4274) 15/7; 43884(2977) 4/7; 44008(3098) 1/7; 44016(3105) 14/7; 44877(10502) 8/7; 44880(10505) 20/6; 44952(10577) 13/7; 44958(10583) 15/6; 44970(10595) 4/7; 44974(10599) 17/6; 45008(9845) 15/7; 45022(9511) 2/7; 45053(9032) 11/6; *45084(9116) 8/7; 45085(9266) 9/7; 45086(9180) 18/6; 45090(9821) 30/6; 45125(9229) 6/7; 45126(9720) 24/6; 45162(9714) 14/7; 45226(9502) 16/6; 45363(9211) 11/7; 45467(9176) 31/5; 45472(9679) 7/6; 45475(9070) 29/6; 45490(9120) 20/6; 45576(9022) 14/6; 45645(9818) 31/5; 45729(9723) 3/6; 47536 22/6; 54491(6191) 3/6; 54506(6212) 11/7; 55126 26/6; 55191 13/6; 55196 15/7; 55219 6/8; 55228 6/7; 55232 8/6; 55240 8/7; 55263 9/7; 55360 22/6; 56269 6/6; 56279 11/6; 56315 23/6; 56327 5/8; 56341 10/6; 56346 15/6; 57245(6058) 5/7; 57264(937) 16/6; 57323(957) 14/7; 57332(6038) 29/6; 57338(1764) 2/8; 57358(1723) 21/6; 57397(1292) 6/7; 57430(6021) 24/6; 57467(1304) 4/8; 57583(1664) 2/7; *57619(1777) 30/6; 57632(1713) 11/7; 57635(1683) 18/6; 57659(1761) 11/6; 57661(1775) 18/6; *57686(1767) 13/7; 57690(1771) 4/6. *Retains L.M.S. on tender. In addition, No. M5359 was re-numbered 45359 on 13/7, tender No. 9060.
Locomotives on Works at commencement of Annual Holiday, 16/7. Erecting Shop: Nos. 908, 1136, 2745, 4234/81, 5047, 5455/57/74/99, 5560, 14464/73, 14639, 15164, 15219, 16327, 17337/38, 17453/67, 17599. Yard: No. 16025 (Works' shunter, awaiting shop repairs).Dump: Nos. 905, M5575, 14448, 14649 (all awaiting shop repairs), 15116 (minus boiler; withdrawn W/E 29/5), 17374 (withdrawn W/E 22/5) and 17422 (minus boiler; agreed for breaking up 7/6). No. 16025 , the Works' 'pug,' burst a tube on 12/7 and No. 17254 (31A) was used as a substitute until the commencement of the Works' Annual Holiday. No. 16025 went into shops for a service repair on 2/8; No. 16030 (31E) having arrived to act as Works' shunter. No. 15116 was towed into the shops ex dump on 2/8 and was cut-up during the ensuing week
SLS/194809
27/08/1949 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 904, 40920, 42197, 2274, 2737, 16294, 57264, 57583. SLS/194910
31/01/1950 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 40154, 40920, 2192, 42807, 56244, 57279. 17303, 57409, 57583. SLS/195003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 920
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
19/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40920    
12/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stranraer (68C)    
13/05/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 40920    

prev prev