Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1000 m/e 01/1902
BR 41000 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 01/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/09/1951
Service Life 49 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
17A Derby 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 29/09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 29/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Static Exhibit
Information Currently on loan at the Severn Valley Railway in the Engine House at Highley as a static exhibit.
Link www.nrm.org.uk/
Status Date 19/03/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1902 To Service To service as LMS Number 1000
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41000    
09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 41000    
25/02/1961 Sightings Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - New paint shop.   Link
15/12/1961 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop - sheeted. SLS 1/1962 Link
06/04/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop. SLS 5/1962 Link
08/06/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop. SLS 7/1962 Link

prev