Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2970 Week
» 20306 Month
» 298102 Year
» 1182483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7001 m/e 11/1932
BR 47001 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class 0F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-4-0ST
Builder Kitson
Works Number 5655
To Service During 11/1932
Withdrawal Sun 25/12/1966
Scrapping During 04/1967
Service Life 34 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26B Agecroft w/e 25/05/1963
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 22/06/1963
41J Langwith Junction w/e 09/10/1965
   Withdrawn 25/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 23A Bank Hall w/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   25/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1932 To Service To service as LMS Number 7001
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5655
   
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 47001    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 47001    

prev prev