Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 762 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4278 Week
» 32236 Month
» 66878 Year
» 1288443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1708 m/e 06/1880
BR 41708 w/e 15/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 1F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 06/1880
Withdrawal Sun 25/12/1966
Service Life 86 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
41J Langwith Junction w/e 09/10/1965
   Withdrawn 25/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 06/12/1947
LOAN 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 01/02/1958
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 23/02/1958
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   25/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1880 To Service To service as LMS Number 1708
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41708    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 41708    

prev prev