Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 321 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18124 Week
» 71140 Month
» 190667 Year
» 3217520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
58188 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
Thu 01/01/1878 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 25/04/1957 |
Service Life |
79 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
01/01/1878 |
20C |
|
Royston |
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/04/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20C |
Royston |
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/04/1957 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58188 |
|
|
04/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
04/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
25/04/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58188 |
|
|