Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 822 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2937 Week
» 25443 Month
» 328633 Year
» 1550198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 58197 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 2F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 03/1880
Withdrawal Wed 09/11/1960
Service Life 80 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1880
33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/03/1955
55D Royston 4w/e 18/05/1957
   Withdrawn on 09/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18A Toton w/e 11/02/1950
LOAN 33A Plaistow 4w/e 26/03/1955
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   on 09/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58197    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
09/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 58197