Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2236 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20039 Week
» 73055 Month
» 192582 Year
» 3219435 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
58199 |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 03/1880 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/12/1959 |
Service Life |
79 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1880 |
11B |
|
Barrow in Furness |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
26/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/11/1955 |
Derby MPD |
In spite of recent Midland Class 4 withdrawals, Nos. 43913/8/42 were all ex-works in Derby Shed Yard on 27/11/1955, with No. 43900 working a ballast train at the north end of the yard. Other interesting engines in the yard, repainted ex-works were Compound No 40936; S.D.J. No. 53801 and Nos. 41752, 58192/9, while Nos. 58182 an 47234 had received Service repairs. |
SLS/195602 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58199 |
|
|
11/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58199 |
|
|